+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
On April 9, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1240ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 986244819