+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100842D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jason S. Miyares
Type:
Primary Sponsor