+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Continued to 1995 in H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions
- VOTE: (48-Y 45-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (48-Y 45-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD8358112 (HB1239H1)
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (15-Y 7-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 1994: Continued to 1995 in H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: (48-Y 45-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor