+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 765 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1238ER)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 040145308
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2004: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor