+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1237ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 15-N)
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 16104199D
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2016: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 15-N)
February 5, 2016: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N)
February 3, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor