+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2003 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 023855869-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 023855869-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 023855869-H1
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 023770869
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2002: Continued to 2003 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2002: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor