+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2013 in General Laws and Technology (10-Y 3-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 41-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 12103596D
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2012: Continued to 2013 in General Laws and Technology (10-Y 3-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
February 9, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
February 9, 2012: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor