+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 5, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
On April 1, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1231ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (90-Y 6-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (30-Y 9-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 9-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Justice
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 31-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 967977158-H1
- Amendment by Mr. Cantor agreed to (67-Y 31-N)
- Amendment #1 by Ms. Connally agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 967977158-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 967977158-EH1
- Passed House (83-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 967977158-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 961765158
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 9-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 31-N)
February 11, 1996: Reported from C. J. with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor