+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 356 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1231ER)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1 (Orrock)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064148552
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor