+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0540)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 540 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1228ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 7-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 7-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (26-Y 12-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with amendment (26-Y 9-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (26-Y 9-N 1-A)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (26-Y 12-N 1-A)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd. (11-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- VOTE: ADOPTION (30-Y 39-N)
- Amendments by Mr. Van Yahres rejected (30-Y 39-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Tate agreed to
- Amendment #2 by Mr. Clement rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment #1 by Mr. Clement rejected (28-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (28-Y 44-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Pending question ordered
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendments by Mr. Tate agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 989590466-H1
- Read second time
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 34-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Wilkins rejected
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 989590466-EH1
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 25-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Howell agreed to
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (66-Y 25-N)
- Passed House (61-Y 34-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 989590466-EH1
- VOTE: ADOPTION (33-Y 39-N)
- Amendment by Ms. Darner rejected (33-Y 39-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (33-Y 38-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Murphy rejected (33-Y 38-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989590466-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (17-Y 8-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 986280466
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (13)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 7-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (26-Y 12-N 1-A)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (26-Y 9-N 1-A)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (37-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Transportation w/amd. (11-Y 4-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 34-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (28-Y 44-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (30-Y 39-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (33-Y 38-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (33-Y 39-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 25-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (17-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor