+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
- Enacted, Chapter 756 (effective 4/20/16)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1228ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 3-N)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (88-Y 9-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 9-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1228ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency clause added by conference committee
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (81-Y 10-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (81-Y 10-N)
- Conference substitute printed 16106239D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, DeSteph, McPike
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates: Miller, Helsel, McQuinn
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16105204D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1228EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Campbell agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105204D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 16105204D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 16103920D
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (14)
April 20, 2016: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 3-N)
April 20, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (88-Y 9-N)
March 11, 2016: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
March 10, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (81-Y 10-N)
March 8, 2016: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2016: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
February 11, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2016: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor