+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 439 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1226ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 12, 2001 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (Y-99 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 013863840-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 013863840-H1
- Read second time
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Carry over bill reprinted 006240840
On November 20, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 013863840-H1
On November 16, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Continued to 2001 in Education (23-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 006240840
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2001: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
January 12, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
November 16, 2000: Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: Continued to 2001 in Education (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor