+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (51-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
- Rereferred to Privileges and Elections
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106816D-H1
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101741D
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor