+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 460 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1224ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12104461D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1224E
- Emergency clause deleted
- Amendments by Delegate Morefield agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 7-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 12104461D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
February 2, 2012: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 7-N)
January 31, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor