+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 11, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
On April 5, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1222ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Mr. Phillips agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 967213400-E
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 967213400
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: Reported from Finance with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor