+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1221ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1221E
- Printed as engrossed 18103358D-E
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103358D
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology