+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/12)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1220ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 12103520D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor