+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106779D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB122H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106779D-H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On December 18, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101903D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2018: Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor