+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/10)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1219ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 10103734D
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2010: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor