+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1219ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 3-N)
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Watkins, O'Brien, Deeds
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Barlow, Saxman, Welch
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 95-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 060865224-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1219E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation sub-committee: #2 (Saxman)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 060865224
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
March 10, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N)
March 10, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: Reported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor