+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/12)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1219ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1219ER)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1219E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 12101132D-E
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 12101132D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor