+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1217ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14103615D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1217E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 14103615D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2014: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
February 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
February 3, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor