+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0894)
On May 19, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 894 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Speaker ruled Gov's recom. not germane
- Ruling of Chair is sustained (59-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: ON GOVERNOR'S RECOMMENDATION (59-Y 38-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 983408811-H1
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1216ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989231298-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989231298
- Referred to Committee on Finance