+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101744D
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor