+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Defeated by Courts of Justice (4-Y 8-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (7-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD0570164 (HB1212E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 1994: Defeated by Courts of Justice (4-Y 8-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amds. (7-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor