+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 207 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1210ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1210H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 067735304-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067735304-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: #3 ABC/Gaming (Gear)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064190424
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor