+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1207ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD4328152 (HB1207S1)
- Reported from R. & S. S. with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD4322152 (HB1207H1)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed