+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 23, 1999 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0976)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov. recomm. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 976 (effective 7/1/99)
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1206ER2)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1206ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (87-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments #2, 3, and 4 agreed to
- Committee amendment #1 rejected
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendments #1 & 2 by Sen. Chichester agreed to
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 99926376-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - com. sub.w/ amds 99926376-EH1
- Amendments by Mr. Murphy agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 999256376-EH1
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Introduced bill reprinted 986962376
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 999256376-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
On December 14, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 986962376