+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1203ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House Block Vote (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1203H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105451D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105451D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 22103780D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 8, 2022: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2022: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor