+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 480 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1202ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 005335230
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor