+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 371 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1202ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1202H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104707D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104707D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 12104086D
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor