+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1199ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 44-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 9-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103498D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2020: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 19, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 44-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 9-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Kathy K.L. Tran
Type:
Primary Sponsor