+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB385-Wardrup) (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 028068852-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 028068852-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 028068852-H1
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 021340852
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2002: Incorporated by Tra. (HB385-Wardrup) (14-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
February 5, 2002: Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor