+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective - see bill)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1198ER)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (19-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 046700100
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 19, 2004: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from H. W. I. (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor