+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Special
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 13-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1197H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104932D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104932D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103942D
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
February 3, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor