+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 25-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Judicial Systems
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102788D
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor