+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
- Enacted, Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/14)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1195ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 14105561D-H1
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1195ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 14104100D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor