+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 372 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1194ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101626D
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor