+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 241 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1193ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 962188264
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor