+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0392)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 392 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1191ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 24-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 16103635D
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
February 15, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N)
February 10, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor