+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104753D