+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1188ER)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1188H1
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee substitute agreed to 067549376-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067549376-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/06 064259376
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor