+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 398 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1188ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD3777188 (HB1188S1)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed LD2740188 (HB1188E)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
February 7, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor