+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104631D
+ − Vote
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor