+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1182ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 12102193D