+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake
On January 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100110D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor