+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 083320592-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB118E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On December 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083320592