+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 372 (effective - see bill)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1177ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1177S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 043349252-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 043349252-S1
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1177H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 043337100-H1
- Read second time
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 043337100-H1
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 046686100
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2004: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor