+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 245 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1177ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106486D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1177H1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106486D-H1
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104095D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions