+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1174ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Pillion, Orrock, Hayes
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Chafin, Dunnavant, Barker
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107208D-S1 (1-Y 98-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1174S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107208D-S1
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107208D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105875D-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1174EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Pillion agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 18105875D-EH1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105875D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104484D
+ − Votes (10)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
February 19, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor